Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 10:23:48 (UTC).

SAMUELS, HOWARD J. VS. CAILLET-BOIS, RICARDO

Case Summary

On 05/06/2004 SAMUELS, HOWARD J filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CAILLET-BOIS, RICARDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1367

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMUELS HOWARD J. TRUSTEE OF THE TULLER AVENUE TRUST

Defendants

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

CAILLET-BOIS RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLER & FLOYD - HARRY E. FLOYD

Attorney at MELLER & FLOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 105.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # CUL462301003 . P/U BASKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/03/04 . FOR (SAMUELS, HOWARD J.) TRUSTEE OF THE (TULLER AVENUE TRUST) . AGAINST (CAILLET-BOIS, RICARDO) , (ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 4353 TULLER AVENUE, CULVER CITY, CA 90230 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CAILLET-BOIS, RICARDO) FOR REJECTION OF ANSWER AND FEE WAIVER SUBMITTED ON 05/21/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2004
  • CALLED DEFENDANT AND TOLD HIM THAT HE NEEDED TO COMPLETE HIS ANSWER AND FEE WAIVER. MR. CAILLET-BOIS ANSWERED THAT HE WAS AWARE OF THIS AND HIS LAWYER HAD SAID THE SAME THING. DEFENDANT SAID HE WAS GOING TO TALK TO HIS LAWYER AND COME IN TO CLERK'S OFFICE ASAP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CAILLET-BOIS, RICARDO) FOR REJECTION OF ANSWER AND FEE WAIVER. FORMS ARE INCOMPLETE AND INCORRECTLY FILLED OUT. SUBMITTED ON 05/19/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (CAILLET-BOIS, RICARDO) , (ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (CAILLET-BOIS, RICARDO) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL485132010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/22/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELLER & FLOYD - HARRY E. FLOYD ESQ