This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 07:08:47 (UTC).

RUSSELL, JENNIFER VS. ASSIL, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 03/08/2005 RUSSELL, JENNIFER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASSIL, ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHY GRECO and LAURA D'AVRI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0041

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KATHY GRECO

LAURA D'AVRI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSSELL JENNIFER

Defendants

ASSIL KERRY INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MALIBU COAST VILLAS LLC.

ASSIL ROBERT INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MALIBU COAST VILLAS LLC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/29/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. KATHY GRECO, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • NOTICE OF OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (ASSIL, ROBERT), INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (MALIBU COAST VILLAS, LLC.) DUE TO NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. LAURA D'AVRI, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 06/13/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 . BOTH PARTIES STATE THAT THIS MATTER HAS SETTLED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2005
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (ASSIL, ROBERT), INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (MALIBU COAST VILLAS, LLC.) . RECEIPT # MAL500503010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (ASSIL, ROBERT), INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (MALIBU COAST VILLAS, LLC.) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 05/02/05 AT 10:00A M. IN DIV. 003 , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • OPPOSITION RE: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT FILED BY (RUSSELL, JENNIFER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (ASSIL, ROBERT), INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (MALIBU COAST VILLAS, LLC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/11/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (ASSIL, ROBERT), INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (MALIBU COAST VILLAS, LLC.) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION . RECEIPT # MAL500503004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (ASSIL, KERRY), INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (MALIBU COAST VILLAS, LLC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/11/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2005
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN MAL500503005. HEARING SET FOR 04/11/05 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV. 003.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.