This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 18:42:58 (UTC).

Rozuk, Edward Vs. Habibi, Saman

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Rozuk Edward against Habibi Saman in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0568

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Philip L. Soto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rozuk Edward

Defendant

Habibi Saman {dds

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/05/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ .57 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # ELM333333036 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ .57 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # ELM333333038 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2001
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED AS TO (ROZUK, EDWARD) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2001
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 0.57 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # 455132003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2001
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ .57 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # ELM333333043 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2001
  • NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL FROM THE SMALL CLAIMS COURT RETURNED AS TO ADDRESSEE UNKNOWN DUE TO ROZUK, EDWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 0.57 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # 455132017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2001
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (HABIBI, SAMAN) {DDS} . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/04/01 AT 02:00P M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # 430356009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: DECLARATION OF ALICIA ESCALERA IN SUPPORT OF DR. HABIBI'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: DECLARATION OF SAMAN HABIBI, D.D.S. IN SUPPORT OF DR. HABIBI'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. RICHARD W. VAN DUSEN, PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY ROZUK, EDWARD . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/18/01 . FOR (ROZUK, EDWARD) . AGAINST (HABIBI, SAMAN) {DDS} . PRINCIPAL $ 4595.00 . COSTS $ 20.00 . TOTAL $ 4615.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (HABIBI, SAMAN) {DDS} .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (HABIBI, SAMAN) {DDS} BY SUB-SERVING ELISA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 COSTS OF $ 00.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 430356007. HEARING SET FOR 04/18/01 AT 08:45 AM IN DIV. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.