This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2016 at 20:40:28 (UTC).

ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORP. VS. DELEON, MARICELA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2000 ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DELEON, MARICELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY LUNA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1540

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TONY LUNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORP.

Defendant

DELEON MARICELA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/03/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY. 720.00 . RECEIPT # 000 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2001
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: CORRECTING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT TO SHOW THAT IT IS A PARTIAL SATISFACTION ONLY. RECEIVED FROM ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORP. AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2001
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 169.04 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2001
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORP.) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION. WE ARE UNABLE TO PROCESS THE REQUEST. OUR RECORDS SHOW A SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09-11-00. ENCLOSED PLEASE FIND COPY OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT WHICH SEEMS CONFUSED. WRIT FEE RETAINED. THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 12/28/00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2000
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:08A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. TONY LUNA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY CYNTHIA MARTINEZ . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2000
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2000
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2000
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/18/00 . FOR (ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORP.) . AGAINST (DELEON, MARICELA) . PRINCIPAL $ 650.00 . COSTS $ 63.00 . TOTAL $ 713.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2000
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (DELEON, MARICELA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2000
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (DELEON, MARICELA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/18/00 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 . COSTS OF $ 36.00 . RML

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2000
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 0000215008. TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 08/18/00 AT 08:45 AM IN DIV. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORP is a litigant