This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 17:20:08 (UTC).

Rodriguez, Lito Vs. Johnson Ford & Co.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Rodriguez Lito against Johnson Ford Co in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0491

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez Lito

Defendant

Johnson Ford & Co. Dba Antelope Valley Ford/Shuttle Lincoln M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2002
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (JOHNSON FORD & CO.) DBA (ANTELOPE VALLEY FORD/SHUTTLE LINCOLN) (MERCURY)ADBA(JOHNSON FORD CORP) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/19/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. A13 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN PAID. HEARING SET FOR 04/19/01 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. A13.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.