This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 04:57:35 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, EDGAR VS. SEGURA, LISA MARIE

Case Summary

On 03/07/2005 RODRIGUEZ, EDGAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEGURA, LISA MARIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN H. REID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0716

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN H. REID

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ EDGAR

RODRIGUEZ OMAR

Defendant

SEGURA LISA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN L. FRIEDMAN - STEVEN L. FRIEDMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN L. FRIEDMAN

Defendant Attorney

SILVA CLASEN & RAFFALOW - PATRICIA M QUINN

Attorney at SILVA CLASEN & RAFFALOW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/21/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 9/28/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2005
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT RE: UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (RODRIGUEZ, EDGAR) , (RODRIGUEZ, OMAR) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 09/28/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO NANCI KIRKPATRICK, DEPT. F RE: CASES NOT ELIGIBLE FOR ADR REFERRAL VIA CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A PROOF OF SERVICE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER IS PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS THE COURT FINDS THAT PROOF OF SERVICE WAS FILED ON 6/7/05. NOTICE IS DEEMED WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SEGURA, LISA MARIE) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 06/14/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SEGURA, LISA MARIE) . RECEIPT # SM500645017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 06/14/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # CUL488416004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/06/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEQ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/05/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WEQ . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 03/04/05

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.