Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 07:25:31 (UTC).

Robinson, Gary Vs. Timphony, Vincent

Case Summary

On 05/07/2002 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Robinson Gary against Timphony Vincent in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0178

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2002

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Preciliano P. Recendez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2002
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. PRECILIANO P. RECENDEZ, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY ATTORNEY GEORGE LIDDLE . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING BY ATTORNEY FRANK RUBIN . CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT REACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2002
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL {NOTICE WAIVED} TO 11/02/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2002
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR DEFENDANT (TIMPHONY, SCARLET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 06/04/02 AT 01:30P M., IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (TIMPHONY, VINCENT) . COSTS OF $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2002
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 05/22/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • ANSWER FILED OF (TIMPHONY, SCARLET) . RECEIPT # WAIVER/CRC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (TIMPHONY, SCARLET) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (TIMPHONY, SCARLET) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: FIRST APPEARANCE/FILING FEES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 06/21/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less