This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 07:10:46 (UTC).

RINK, GENE C. VS. KOCHMAN, DAVID

Case Summary

On 04/18/2005 RINK, GENE C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KOCHMAN, DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY ADAMSON and LAWRENCE J. MIRA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0066

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY ADAMSON

LAWRENCE J. MIRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RINK GENE C.

Defendant

KOCHMAN DAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/10/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2005
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2005
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . HON. LAWRENCE J. MIRA PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING BY ROBERT PFENNING . RESPONDENT APPEARING . COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. LAWRENCE J. MIRA PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: COURT ORDER . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY AUGUST 29TH, 2005 IS HEREBY VACATED AND THE MATTER IS CONTINUED TO MONDAY SEPTEMBER 26, 2005 AT 8:30 AM IN DIVISION 001. CLERKS OFFICE TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO TO 09/26/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2005
  • NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER AND RULING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED BY (RINK, GENE C.) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 08/29/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # MAL498434004 . CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE: HEARING FILED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED BY (KOCHMAN, DAVID) . RECEIPT NUMBER MAL136401007 . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2005
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/27/05 . FOR (RINK, GENE C.) . AGAINST (KOCHMAN, DAVID) . PRINCIPAL $ 1724.24 . COSTS $ 60.00 . TOTAL $ 1784.24 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (KOCHMAN, DAVID) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/27/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2005
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 06/27/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2005
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (KOCHMAN, DAVID) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN MAL500503005. HEARING SET FOR 05/23/05 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV. 003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (KOCHMAN, DAVID) . RECEIPT # MAL500503005 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.