This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2016 at 04:06:26 (UTC).

RICKLEY, REBECCA A. VS. CASA DE CADILLAC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2004 RICKLEY, REBECCA A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASA DE CADILLAC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY ADAMSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0047

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY ADAMSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICKLEY REBECCA A.

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

CASA DE CADILLAC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF NATASHA ROIT - NATASHA ROIT

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF NATASHA ROIT

Defendant Attorney

NORMAN J. HOFFMAN, INC. A PROFESSIONAL - ROBERT PETER WEISS ESQ

Attorney at NORMAN J. HOFFMAN, INC. A PROFESSIONAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/29/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. COMMISSIONER TERRY ADAMSON PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS THE CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. COMMISSIONER TERRY ADAMSON PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. MATTER CONTINUED TO 11/08/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/04/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/24/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION) FOR REJECTION OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; THE FILING FEES FOR AN ANSWER ON THIS CASE ARE $149.00. THE AMOUNT SENT IS INCORRECT. PLEASE REFER TO THE FEE SCHEDULE ENCLOSED. SUBMITTED ON 04/23/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CASA DE CADILLAC) BY ROBERT PETER WEISS . RECEIPT # MAL489856002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CASA DE CADILLAC) FOR REJECTION OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; THE FILING FEE FOR AN ANSWER ON THIS CASE IS INCORRECT. REFER TO FEE SCHEDULE FOR CORRECT AMOUNT SUBMITTED ON 04/22/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/04 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 03/23/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2004
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL489856003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS, ROBERT PETER