This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2016 at 04:04:20 (UTC).

RETAILERS NATIONAL BANK VS. GOMEZ, ANNA

Case Summary

On 02/13/2004 RETAILERS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GOMEZ, ANNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0026

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RETAILERS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

GOMEZ ANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C. - DAVID C. SCOTT ESQ

Attorney at PATENAUDE & FELIX, A.P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/10/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2004
  • THE ONLY PURPOSE OF THIS ENTRY IS TO STAT THE PREVIOUS ENTERED DISMISSAL AND TO CHANGE THE CASE STATUS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2004
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/15/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2004
  • ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SIGNED BY LAWRENCE J. MIRA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2004
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (RETAILERS NATIONAL BANK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2004
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE RECEIVED. CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2004
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/13/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL489856002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/14/04 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/13/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2004
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.