This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 11:21:16 (UTC).

RAY, HELEN VS. ANDINO, JORGE

Case Summary

On 01/03/2005 RAY, HELEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDINO, JORGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAY HELEN

Defendant

ANDINO JORGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY SERVICE P/U BOX . RECEIPT # CUL474108012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 83.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 01/14/05 . FOR (RAY, HELEN) . AGAINST (ANDINO, JORGE) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3100 WEST VERNON AVE, LOS ANGELES, CA 90008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ANDINO, JORGE) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ANDINO, JORGE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (RAY, HELEN) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED ON 01/11/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2005
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL488416006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2005
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/27/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less