Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 07:14:28 (UTC).

RAHMANIAN, FRANK VS. TELLEZ, DINA L.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2002 RAHMANIAN, FRANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TELLEZ, DINA L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0141

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAHMANIAN FRANK

Defendants

TELLEZ DINA L.

NOESKE NEIL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2002
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2002
  • ANSWER FILED OF DINA TELLEZ AND NEIL NOESKE . RECEIPT # WAIVER/CRC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DINA TELLEZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2002
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF DINA TELLEZ SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: 1ST APPEARANCE/FILING COSTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2002
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NEIL NOESKE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2002
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF NEIL NOESKE SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: 1ST APPEARANCE/FILING COSTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI478057006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 05/23/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less