This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 05:21:25 (UTC).

R SCOTT TUCKER & ASSOCIATES VS. CLOW, GUY

Case Summary

On 06/25/2004 R SCOTT TUCKER ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CLOW, GUY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0690

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R SCOTT TUCKER & ASSOCIATES

Defendants

MANYAHILHAL YILMA

CLOW GUY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN P GRAYSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2004
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2004
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2004
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2004
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2004
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2004
  • DEFAULT PACKAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2004
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R. SCOTT TUCKER & ASSOCIATES is a litigant