Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 11:09:40 (UTC).

PUBLIC STORAGE, INC. VS. EDEN, JAMES

Case Summary

On 06/18/2004 PUBLIC STORAGE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDEN, JAMES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1795

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PUBLIC STORAGE INC.

Defendants

EDEN JAMES

DOES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TODD A. BRISCO - TODD A. BRISCO ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TODD A. BRISCO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/17/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIV. WEQ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • COURTHOUSE CLOSURE/CASE TRANSFER/RESCHEDULE NOTICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (PUBLIC STORAGE, INC.) FOR REJECTION OF PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED. THIS MATTER WAS REVIEWED BY THE COURT AND YOUR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WAS DENIED. (SEE NOTICE ATTACHED) SUBMITTED ON 12/02/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2004
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO 003 RE: PROPOSED ORDER RE; LOST ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL LIEN NOTICE AND LOST WRITTEN RENTAL AGREEMENT; PROPOSED ORDER TO ACCEPT COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (PUBLIC STORAGE, INC.) FOR REJECTION OF PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED. THIS MATTER WAS REVIEWED BY THE COURT AND YOUR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WAS DENIED. (SEE LETTER ATTACHED) SUBMITTED ON 07/28/04

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (EDEN, JAMES) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THROUGH DOES 1 TO 25 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2004
  • PER TERRI STEWART, FROM TODD BRISCO'S OFFICE DEFAULT PACKAGE IS TO BE RETURNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (PUBLIC STORAGE, INC.) FOR REJECTION OF THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED AT THE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. SUBMITTED ON 07/12/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2004
  • DUE TO A CLERICAL ERROR, PLAINTIFF WAS ASSIGNED THE WRONG CASE NUMBER OF #04A01786.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL485132013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 08/20/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 11/19/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 06/18/04

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUBLIC STORAGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRISCO TODD A