This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 18:13:19 (UTC).

Providian National Bank Vs. Karmouche, Samira

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Providian National Bank against Karmouche Samira in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0648

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Providian National Bank

Defendant

Karmouche Samira

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2001
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/16/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 00F . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.