Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 16:15:56 (UTC).

PRINTING INDUSTRIES CREDIT UNI VS. GUZMAN, JOHN

Case Summary

On 02/20/2001 PRINTING INDUSTRIES CREDIT UNI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUZMAN, JOHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHEL DOWNEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0429

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHEL DOWNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRINTING INDUSTRIES CREDIT UNION

Defendant

GUZMAN JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/09/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 5.24 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # ELA446805003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. MITCHEL DOWNEY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/01/01 . FOR (PRINTING INDUSTRIES CREDIT UNION) . AGAINST (GUZMAN, JOHN) . PRINCIPAL $ 561.96 . COSTS $ 75.00 . TOTAL $ 636.96 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (GUZMAN, JOHN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GUZMAN, JOHN) BY SUB-SERVING PATRICIA SALAS . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/01/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 05/01/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GUZMAN, JOHN) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ELA000215002. TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 04/02/01 AT 08:45 AM IN DIV. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRINTING INDUSTRIES CREDIT UNION is a litigant