Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 10:12:38 (UTC).

PRIME WEST MANAGEMENT VS. SALAZAR,JOSE M.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2004 PRIME WEST MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SALAZAR,JOSE M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1267

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIME WEST MANAGEMENT

Defendants

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

SALAZAR JOSE M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SAM CHANDRA - SAM CHANDRA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SAM CHANDRA

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ERIC E. CASTELBLANCO - LAWRENCE S. STRAUSS ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC E. CASTELBLANCO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2004
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 221.10 FILED BY ATTY FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2004
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SALAZAR,JOSE M.) . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING EXECUTION . APPLICATION GRANTED. THE MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT HEARING IS ADVANCED TO THIS DATE AND GRANTED. THE JUDGMENT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON 6-10-04 IS ADVANCED AND VACATED. THE WRIT OF POSSESSION PREVIOUSLY ISSUED ON 6-15-04 IS RECALLED AND QUASHED. DEFENDANT IS GRANTED 5 DAYS TO ANSWER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AGAINST (SALAZAR,JOSE M.) SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER FORWARDED TO THE SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (PRIME WEST MANAGEMENT) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION. MATTER SET FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT ON 5/26/04. SUBMITTED ON 05/11/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THIS MATTER IS ADVANCED FROM 5-26-04 AND CONTINUED TO 6-4-04AT 9AM IN DIV 1 DUE TO THIS DIVISION BEING CLOSED. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/04/04 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 001 . RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (SALAZAR,JOSE M.) , (ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2004
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS; NOTICE OF SUBMISSION ON PLEADINGS C.C.P. SECTIONS 418.10(A)(1); 1167.4 , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # CUL271571003 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/26/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 485132011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/27/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME WEST MANAGEMENT AND INVESTMENTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANDRA, SAM