This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2016 at 19:07:13 (UTC).

PRATO, JAMES J. VS EXPERT PLANT CARE, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2005 PRATO, JAMES J filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EXPERT PLANT CARE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL P. RAMIREZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0120

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL P. RAMIREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRATO JAMES J.

Defendant

EXPERT PLANT CARE INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE DOWNEY COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM WH 05S00120 TO DOW05SW0120

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 , HON. DANIEL P. RAMIREZ, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PROPRIA PERSONA . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY RILEY WILSON, PRESIDENT AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • DocketCOURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • DocketAFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/02/05 . FOR (PRATO, JAMES J.) . AGAINST (EXPERT PLANT CARE, INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 918.62 . COSTS $ 52.00 . TOTAL $ 970.62 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (EXPERT PLANT CARE, INC.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO EXPERT PLANT CARE INC LEAVING WITH JOAN JONES . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/02/05 AT 08:15A M, IN DIV. 006 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN WH0481799013. HEARING SET FOR 03/02/05 AT 08:15 AM IN DIV. 006.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXPERT PLANT CARE INC. is a litigant