This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 07:14:30 (UTC).

POLES, MEL VS ANDERSON, LUKE

Case Summary

On 02/09/2005 POLES, MEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDERSON, LUKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0119

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POLES MEL

Defendant

ANDERSON LUKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LISHNER, LAURENCE H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2007
  • APPLICATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2007
  • APPLICATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST OF $54.00 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2005
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • JUDGMENT TENTATIVELY GRANTED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2005
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR 03/02/05, 08:30 AM, DIV/DEPT 92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2005
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LISHNER LAURENCE H.