This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 22:11:05 (UTC).

PLATTS, KERRY LYNN VS. DUER, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 04/20/2005 PLATTS, KERRY LYNN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DUER, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0065

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLATTS KERRY LYNN

Defendants

LOVEBRAND LISA

DUER JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORDSTROM, STEELE, NICOLETTE & BLYTHE - RUSSELL E. NORDSTROM ESQ

Attorney at NORDSTROM, STEELE, NICOLETTE & BLYTHE

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LYDIA BOUZAGLOU-NEWCOMB - JENNA FISCHER-REYES ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LYDIA BOUZAGLOU-NEWCOMB

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/07/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2005
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT RE: UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (PLATTS, KERRY LYNN) . DATE OF SETTLEMENT 11/18/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (DUER, JOSEPH) , (LOVEBRAND, LISA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (PLATTS, KERRY LYNN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (DUER, JOSEPH) , (LOVEBRAND, LISA) . RECEIPT # MAL136401003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (DUER, JOSEPH) . COSTS OF $ 57.83

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • DECLARATION RE: REASONABLE DILIGENCE AS TO JOSEPH DUER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (LOVEBRAND, LISA) FILED. COSTS OF $ 147.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/21/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # MAL500503001 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.