This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2016 at 08:48:31 (UTC).

PIERSON, FRED VS. FUSTUKIAN, DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 09/09/2004 PIERSON, FRED filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FUSTUKIAN, DANIELLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY ADAMSON and LAWRENCE J. MIRA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0070

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY ADAMSON

LAWRENCE J. MIRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIERSON FRED

Defendant

FUSTUKIAN DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - DUANE HALL

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/10/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. COMMISSIONER TERRY ADAMSON PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2005
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/16/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. COMMISSIONER TERRY ADAMSON PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS MATTER PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • NOTICE RE: SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. LAWRENCE J. MIRA PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. . MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 10/25/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS COSTS $35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ALL OTHER TENANTS IN POSSESSION . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 10/18/04 AT 08:30A M., IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (FUSTUKIAN, DANIELLE) . RECEIPT # MAL500503007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL500503001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less