Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 08:24:51 (UTC).

PEEPLES, TANISHA VS. SILVER COIN LAUNDRY MAT

Case Summary

On 12/30/2004 PEEPLES, TANISHA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SILVER COIN LAUNDRY MAT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN H. REID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3924

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN H. REID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEEPLES TANISHA

Defendants

MATSUMOTO BOB

SILVER COIN LAUNDRY MAT

MATSUMOTO SCHIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - WILLIAM ALAN SOBEL

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES, LYDIA BOUZAGLOU-NEWCOMB - DEAN C FERRARO

Attorney at LAW OFFICES, LYDIA BOUZAGLOU-NEWCOMB

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/04/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • NOTICE RE: CHANGE OF OFFICE NAME FILED, NEW NAME IS AS FOLLOW: LAW OFFICES, LYDIA BOUZAGLOU-NEWCOMB, MANAGING ATTORNEY; FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT (SILVER COIN LAUNDRY MAT) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SILVER COIN LAUNDRY MAT) , (MATSUMOTO, BOB) , (MATSUMOTO, SCHIM) . RECEIPT # SM500645028 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: OSC RE SERVICE/DISMISSAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS DISCHARGED. SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOIR PLAINTIFF FILED 4-19-05. CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW DATE OF 5-10-05 TO STAND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2005
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (PEEPLES, TANISHA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 04/25/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEQ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN FEE WAIVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/09/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/10/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 12/30/04

    Read MoreRead Less