Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2016 at 15:18:59 (UTC).

PEARTREE APARTMENTS VS. HANNAH, PHILIP

Case Summary

On 09/17/2001 PEARTREE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HANNAH, PHILIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0375

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEARTREE APARTMENTS

Defendants

HANNAH PHILIP

HANNAH MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - JACK LEVY

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2001
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL HEARING RETURNED AS TO HANNAH, MARIE DUE TO MOVED LEFT NO ADDRESS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2001
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL HEARING RETURNED AS TO HANNAH, PHILP DUE TO MOVED LEFT NO ADDRESS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2001
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 11/07/01 AT 01:30P M., IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2001
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2001
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ALL UNNAMED TENANTS) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2001
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2001
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 10/18/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2001
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2001
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PHILIP HANNAH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2001
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF PHILIP HANNAH SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: 1ST APPEARANCE/FILING COST .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2001
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2001
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARIE HANNAH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2001
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF MARIE HANNAH SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: 1ST APPEARANCE/FILING COST .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2001
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 10/31/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less