This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 10:18:22 (UTC).

PARK WEST UNITS VS. CENTANNI, PHILLIP

Case Summary

On 03/10/2003 PARK WEST UNITS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CENTANNI, PHILLIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0269

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK WEST UNITS

Defendant

CENTANNI PHILLIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM ESQ, SHERYL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2003
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2003
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2003
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • DocketJUDGMENT GRANTED AS TO ALL UNNAMED TENANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2003
  • DocketDEFAULT PACKAGE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2003
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2003
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2003
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2003
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2003
  • DocketMEMO TO SET REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2003
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2003
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDELBAUM, SHERYL