Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 10:01:48 (UTC).

PALM CHANNEL VS. JOHNSON, CLEMENTINE

Case Summary

On 04/16/2004 PALM CHANNEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON, CLEMENTINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1146

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALM CHANNEL LLC

Defendants

JOHNSON CLEMENTINE

JOHNSON SAMUEL

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRED M. SZKOLNIK - FRED M. SZKOLNIK

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF FRED M. SZKOLNIK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/03/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RETURNED. COURT ORDERED THE CASE DISMISSED ON 7/2/04 SUBMITTED ON 07/06/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2004
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 07/02/04 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT IS LODGED ONLY THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2004
  • LETTER RECEIVED FROM DEFENDANTS-LETTER TO BE PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 05/24/04 AT 08:30A M., IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2004
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (JOHNSON, SAMUEL) SIGNED AND FILED. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (JOHNSON, CLEMENTINE) SIGNED AND FILED. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (JOHNSON, CLEMENTINE) , (JOHNSON, SAMUEL) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (JOHNSON, CLEMENTINE) , (JOHNSON, SAMUEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2004
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV003 RE: FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL485132001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/17/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZKOLNIK FRED M.