This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 06:56:59 (UTC).

PALISADES COLLECTION L.L.C. VS. JOHNSON, KYRAH R.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2005 PALISADES COLLECTION L L C filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHNSON, KYRAH R. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN H. REID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1229

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN H. REID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALISADES COLLECTION L.L.C.

Defendant

JOHNSON KYRAH R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C. - RAYMOND A. PATENAUDE ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/30/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER IS PLACED OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL WAS FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION ON 1-12-06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2006
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 437(C) CCP, SUPPORTING DECLARATION(S), POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, AND SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED. RECEIPT # SM000900035 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/18/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE AT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED BY (PALISADES COLLECTION L.L.C.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2005
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2005
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (JOHNSON, KYRAH R.) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. WEA FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2005
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ON APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (JOHNSON, KYRAH R.) SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR 06/22/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEA . THE SUBSTANTIAL EVIDENTIARY CONFLICT TO BE RESOLVED BY THE HEARING IS: APPLICANT STATES SHE HAS NO INCOME WHATSOEVER. CONFLICT IN OBTAINING CREDIT CARD ABSENT INCOME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (JOHNSON, KYRAH R.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (JOHNSON, KYRAH R.) . RECEIPT # F/W .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (JOHNSON, KYRAH R.) . COSTS OF $ 47.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (JOHNSON, KYRAH R.) . COSTS OF $ 47.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM481447009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/02/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/01/05

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.