This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2016 at 17:04:23 (UTC).

OWEN PIANO CO INC VS JUDAKEN, MARK

Case Summary

On 08/01/2005 OWEN PIANO CO INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JUDAKEN, MARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8771

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OWEN MARGUERITE C

OWEN PIANO CO INC

Defendants

NISSAN WOODWORKS INC

JUDAKEN MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRISKELL, ROBERT L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2008
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2005
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2005
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2005
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 11/18/05 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV 8B, ROOM 426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2005
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2005
  • OSC SET 10/18/05, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 8B, RM 426, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NISSAN WOODWORKS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRISKELL ROBERT I.