This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 22:19:45 (UTC).

OSORIO, SANDRA VS. PARTLOW, GEMMA IRENE

Case Summary

On 07/28/2005 OSORIO, SANDRA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PARTLOW, GEMMA IRENE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0148

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OSORIO CLARISSE A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA OS

OSORIO ALBERTO

OSORIO CLAUDIA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA OS

OSORIO NICOLE A MINOR BY AND THROUGHHER GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA OSORIO

OSORIO SANDRA

Defendants

PARTLOW STELLA B.

PARTLOW GEMMA IRENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHERIN, SEDLEY & YELSKY - MARVIN S. CHERIN

Attorney at CHERIN, SEDLEY & YELSKY

Defendant Attorney

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR - PATRICK J. GIBBS

Attorney at FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2008
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/09/08 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2006
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL/DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED. MATTER IS AMENABLE/IS REFERRED TO MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2006
  • DocketNOTICE RE: TAKING DEFENDANTS' GEMMA IRENE PARTLOW AND STELLA B. PARTLOW MOTIONS TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # MAL136401014 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/19/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2006
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTIONS , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # NA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/19/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (OSORIO, SANDRA) , (OSORIO, ALBERTO) , (OSORIO, NICOLE) A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA OSORIO , (OSORIO, CLAUDIA) A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA OSORIO .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (PARTLOW, GEMMA IRENE) , (PARTLOW, STELLA B.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2005
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2005
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/18/06 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/11/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2005
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA OSORIO FOR CLAUDIA OSORIO FILED BY (OSORIO, SANDRA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA OSORIO FOR CLARISSE OSORIO FILED BY (OSORIO, SANDRA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA OSORIO FOR NICOLE OSORIO FILED BY (OSORIO, SANDRA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING SANDRA OSORIO GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NICOLE OSORIO , SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING SANDRA OSORIO GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CLAUDIA OSORIO , SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING SANDRA OSORIO GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR CLARISSE OSORIO , SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL136401006.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH