This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2016 at 19:04:19 (UTC).

ONGSING, MANUEL VS. LOYA, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 07/22/2005 ONGSING, MANUEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOYA, RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0705

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONGSING MANUEL

Defendants

DIAZ ELAINE

LOYA RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - LAURA MASSEY

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2006
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/23/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2006
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/12/05 , FOR (ONGSING, MANUEL) , AGAINST (LOYA, RICHARD) , (DIAZ, ELAINE) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 18197 SUNDOWNER WAY #812, CANYON COUNTRY, CA 91351 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 51.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2005
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW467864007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO RICHARD LOYA . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (LOYA, RICHARD) , ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2005
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS TO (DIAZ, ELAINE) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DIAZ, ELAINE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2005
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW507586007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 09/23/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASSEY ESQ., LAURA