Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 02:16:46 (UTC).

OCWEN FEDERAL BANK, FSB VS. MULIADI, ROBIN

Case Summary

On 11/28/2001 OCWEN FEDERAL BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MULIADI, ROBIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0951

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCWEN FEDERAL BANK FSB

Defendant

MULIADI ROBIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KURT T. LOFLAND, A PROFESSIONAL CORP. - KURT T. LOFLAND

Attorney at KURT T. LOFLAND, A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MULIADI, ROBIN) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS STATUS CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR HEARING FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/03/02 , AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO LAW OFFICES OF KURT T. LOFLAND (OUT BOX) FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT: PREMATURE. PLEASE SUBMIT UPDATED DEFAULT WITH NEW MAILING. SUBMITTED ON 02/25/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (MULIADI, ROBIN) . COSTS OF $ 38.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED. BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (OCWEN FEDERAL BANK, FSB) FOR REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE - SERVICE BELONGS TO CASE AT THE LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT. **THE SUMMONS WAS FILED. SUBMITTED ON 02/05/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI478057002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2001
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 03/01/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocwen Federal Bank is a litigant