This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 13:39:34 (UTC).

OCAMPO, ALVIN VS. NORMAN, LISA

Case Summary

On 08/29/2005 OCAMPO, ALVIN filed an Other lawsuit against NORMAN, LISA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KEVIL W. MARTIN, MARINA R. DINI, PAUL DOYLE, LLOYD NASH, J. CARMICHAEL and S. SCHROEDER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1126

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LLOYD NASH

Presiding Judges

KEVIL W. MARTIN

MARINA R. DINI

PAUL DOYLE

J. CARMICHAEL

S. SCHROEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCAMPO ALVIN

Defendant

NORMAN LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINH NGUYEN-DUY ATTORNEY AT LAW - MINH NGUYEN-DUY ESQ

Attorney at MINH NGUYEN-DUY ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARSHA MUNEMURA - STEVEN D. LEVINE ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARSHA MUNEMURA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2008
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2008
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/19/08 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2007
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004 , HON. KEVIL W. MARTIN, COMMISSIONER WITH J. CARMICHAEL, CLERK PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PURSUANT TO DELAY REDUCTION POLICY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 11:27P M, IN DIV. 004 , HON. PAUL DOYLE, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE WITH J. CARMICHAEL, CLERK PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. MATTER CONTINUED TO 01/26/07 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004 . PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • ON 7/21/06 THIS CASE WAS SET FOR A POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISM FOR 9/14/06 AT 1:45PM IN DIV. 4; THE CLERK WAS TO GIVE NOTICE. THE CLERK'S ENTRY WAS NOT MADE, THE PARTIES WERE NOT GIVEN NOTICE OF THE HEARING AND THE CAE WAS NOT CALLED FOR HEARING ON 9/14/06. ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE CAES IS RESET FOR HEARING ON 11/17/06 AT 10:30AM IN DEPARTMENT 004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/17/06 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004 . RE: FAILURE TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:45P M, IN DIV. 004 , HON. MARINA R. DINI, JUDGE PRO TEM WITH S. SCHROEDER, CLERK PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS STATUS CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR HEARING FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/14/06 , AT 01:45P M, IN DIV. 004 . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2005
  • NOTICE OF ALL PURPOSE CASE ASSIGNMENT AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • NOTICE RE:CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LISA NORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT FILED BY ALVIN OCAMPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • SUPERIOR COURT MINUTES ENTERED 08/23/05 RE:CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. MATTER IS CALLED FOR HEARING. THE COURT CONDUCTS A HEARING AND CONCLUDES THAT THE MATTER IS BELOW THE JURISDICTION OF THIS COURT, AND WITHOUT OPPOSITION, ORDERS THE CASE RECLASSIFIED AND TRANSFERRED TO THE SANTA CLARITA LIMITED JURISDICTION COURT. THE PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF CASE HISTORY REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/26/06 AT 08:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/29/05

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE STEVEN D. ESQ.