This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2016 at 18:44:55 (UTC).

NORTH AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPAN VS. GARCIA, MAURICIO

Case Summary

On 03/17/2000 NORTH AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA, MAURICIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0218

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNS

Defendants

GARCIA MAURICIO

RAMIREZ VICENTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSS PITE & DUNCAN, LLP - JOSEPHINE E. PIRANIO

Attorney at MOSS PITE & DUNCAN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/19/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2000
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2000
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS RETURNED AS TO (GARCIA, MAURICIO) , (RAMIREZ, VICENTE) DUE TO UNKNOWN REASON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2000
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2000
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2000
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. (S)RML . RN PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2000
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. DAVID SOTELO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: COURT ORDERS MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION 6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2000
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. DAVID SOTELO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING RICHARD J. MEEHAN, ATTORNEY J. MEEHAN . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR. NO PRESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2000
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2000
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2000
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP FILED. REQUEST FILED & DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GARCIA, MAURICIO) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ON 04/11/00 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. RML(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2000
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2000
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (RAMIREZ, VICENTE) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2000
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2000
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CLAIMANT VICENTE RAMIREZ . . RN .00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2000
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (RAMIREZ, VICENTE) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2000
  • ANSWER FILED OF (RAMIREZ, VICENTE) . RN .00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2000
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 235366042.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2000
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSS PITE & DUNCAN, LLP - JOSEPHINE E. PIRANIO