Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 07:02:54 (UTC).

NIJJAR, PETE VS. CRUZ, PALERMO

Case Summary

On 03/15/2002 NIJJAR, PETE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CRUZ, PALERMO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0102

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVICTION RECOVERY GROUP

Defendants

HOAGLAND MARK

CRUZ PALERMO AKA CRUZ PALEMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVICTION RECOVERY GROUP - HARRIS, WENDY M.

Attorney at EVICTION RECOVERY GROUP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2012
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO EVICTION RECOVERY GROUP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY FILED. WENDY M. HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1569.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 12C00904 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • PURSUANT TO A RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED ON THIS CASE AND ALL PAPERS HAVING BEEN PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER, THEREFORE, THE OLD CASE JACKET WAS DESTROYED ON 04/10/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2002
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2002
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. {MAIL} . RECEIPT # SNI019482002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 28.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SNI439479004 . SHERIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PALEMON CRUZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2002
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF PALEMON CRUZ SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: 1ST APPEARANCE/FILING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2002
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARK HOAGLAND .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2002
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF MARK HOAGLAND SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: 1ST APPEARANCE/FILING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2002
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI478057007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 04/29/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVICTION RECOVERY GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS WENDY M.