This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 20:12:24 (UTC).

NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS VS. BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA

Case Summary

On 03/06/2000 NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBRA W. YANG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0225

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEBRA W. YANG

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS

ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER

Defendant

BOLLINGER CYNTHIA AKA BOLLINGER CYNTHIA MARIE AK

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - ERNEST A. MARTZ ESQ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BLAIN & ASSOCIATES - TONY BLAIN ESQ

Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ERNEST A. MARTZ - ERNEST A. MARTZ ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/14/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2002
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 25.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2001
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2001
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF PHONE NUMBER FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2001
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # SM000900004 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2001
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 145.58 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2001
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # SM000900002 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2001
  • DocketJUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2001
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/27/01 . FOR (NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS) . AGAINST (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA) AKA (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA MARIE) AKA (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA M.) . PRINCIPAL $ 13899.36 . ATTY. FEES $ 660.00 . INTEREST $ 3015.75 . COSTS $ 129.00 . TOTAL $ 17,704.11 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2000
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER) PERSON SERVED: SISTER MARIE MADELEINE, PRESIDENT . COSTS OF $ 156.85 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2000
  • DocketSUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS) , (ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2000
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE LOCAL RULES REGARDING A DELAY REDUCTION STANDARDS OF THE FOLLOWING . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/05/00 AT 10:45A M, IN DIV. WEA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2000
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: OF TERI NEAL IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2000
  • DocketGENERAL DENIAL OF (NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS) TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA) AKA (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA MARIE) AKA (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA M.) FILED. RN PAID .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2000
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA) AKA (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA MARIE) AKA (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA M.) . RN PAID .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2000
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (ST. JOHN'S HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER) . CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (NCO FINANCIAL SYSTEMS) . RN PAID .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2000
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA) AKA (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA MARIE) AKA (BOLLINGER, CYNTHIA M.) . COSTS OF $ 22.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2000
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2000
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less