This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:51:02 (UTC).

NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC VS. GUSTAFF, CARLO C.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2012 NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GUSTAFF, CARLO C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH ABRAMS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1846

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUDITH ABRAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC. ASSIGNEE NCSCORP

Defendant

GUSTAFF CARLO C. AKA CARLSSON CARLO G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J PUGH - JOHN J. PUGH

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J PUGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (GUSTAFF, CARLO C.) AKA (CARLSSON,CARLO G.) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 03/14/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 04/16/12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C01846 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 30.00 . RECEIPT # 053524012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 02C01846 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 180.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 14692.77 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 685.00 FILED BY (NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC.) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PHONE NUMBER FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC.) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO NCSCORP, 1340 12TH AVENUE LONGVIEW, WA. 98632 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1478.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2003
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # 044357002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 , HON. JUDGE JUDITH ABRAMS PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: PETITION IS GRANTED. ORDER GRANTING PETITON FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD IS SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2002
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS FOR THE PLAINTIFF :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/14/02 . FOR (NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC.) 03/02/12 ASSIGNEE (NCSCORP,) . AGAINST (GUSTAFF, CARLO C.) AKA (CARLSSON,CARLO G.) . PRINCIPAL $ 14348.16 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 523.50 . INTEREST $ 794.05 . COSTS $ 135.30 . TOTAL $ 15,801.01 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2002
  • NOTICE RE: HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; PTS. AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: OF JOHNJ. PUGH IN SUPPORT OF AWARD OF FEES AND COSTS INCURRED TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; NTC. OF HEARING; PTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION; PROPOSED ORDER; JUDGMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GUSTAFF, CARLO C.) BY U.S. MAIL . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM / REJECT ARBITRATION AWARD ON 11/14/02 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2002
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM/REJECT ARBITRATION AWARD FILED. RN BH278865008.

    Read MoreRead Less