This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2016 at 12:07:48 (UTC).

National Credit Acceptance Inc Vs Escobar, Rolando R

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by National Credit Acceptance Inc against Escobar Rolando R in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4515

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Credit Acceptance Inc

Defendants

Escobar Rolando Ros

Escobar Rolando R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; RETURNED VIA MAIL/OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • THIRD PARTY ADDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • A S S I G N M E N T O F J U D G M E N T F I L E D A N D E N T E R E D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • NO CASE ACTION ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2008
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2002
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2001
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2001
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2001
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2001
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2001
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2001
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2001
  • OSC SET 10/02/01, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 8B, RM 426, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.