This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2016 at 18:10:15 (UTC).

MOORE, VIVIAN VS. ROMERO JR, ARMANDO

Case Summary

On 10/05/2000 MOORE, VIVIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROMERO JR, ARMANDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL DONNELLY, MICHAEL J. DUFFY and GLORIA DUNN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0796

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL DONNELLY

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

GLORIA DUNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE VIVIAN

Defendant

ROMERO JR ARMANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEDIN BEGAKIS & BISH - MINDY S. BISH

Attorney at SEDIN BEGAKIS & BISH

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KURT BOYD - KURT BOYD ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KURT BOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2004
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2003
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (MOORE, VIVIAN) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2003
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2003
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO LAW OFFICES OF MINDY S. BEGAKIS & BISH (COUNTER) FOR REJECTION OF DISMISSAL: ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL MUST BE CONSISTENT WITH CASE. THE COURT REFLECTS THE ADDRESS: 312 W. ARDEN AVE. PLEASE SUBMIT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS. SUBMITTED ON 01/23/03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2002
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, MATTER CONTINUED TO 01/29/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2002
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2002
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2002
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS STATUS CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR HEARING FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/24/02 , AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2002
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2002
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. GLORIA DUNN, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. MATTER CONTINUED TO 11/05/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . NOTICE WAIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2001
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED. {BY PLAINTIFF}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2001
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (ROMERO JR, ARMANDO) . RECEIPT # SNI019482005 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2001
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2001
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PLAINTIF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. THE COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUED TO 06/19/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2001
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, STATEMENT OF LOCATION, DELAY REDUCTION POLICY, STATUS CONFERENCE *** FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROMERO JR, ARMANDO) . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2001
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED. BY PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2001
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/13/01 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2000
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI247961008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2000
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2000
  • DocketNEXT ACTION DUE 03/05/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM . POSSIBLE STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BISH MINDY SUSAN