Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 21:46:05 (UTC).

MOHAWK FACTORING, INC. VS. 20TH CENTURY FLOOR SERVICE, IN

Case Summary

On 08/02/2002 MOHAWK FACTORING, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against 20TH CENTURY FLOOR SERVICE, IN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0665

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOHAWK FACTORING INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

20TH CENTURY FLOOR SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SACCOMAN LINDA D. INDIVIDUALLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT G. MINER - ROBERT G. MINER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT G. MINER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS THE MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 02/04/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2002
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (MOHAWK FACTORING, INC.) A DELAWARE CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT;CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;COVER SHEET ;ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (20TH CENTURY FLOOR SERVICE, INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;COVER SHEET; ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (SACCOMAN, LINDA D.) INDIVIDUALLY . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (20TH CENTURY FLOOR SERVICE, INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION , (SACCOMAN, LINDA D.) INDIVIDUALLY . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2002
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/19/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/02/02

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOHAWK FACTORING LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINER ROBERT G. LAW OFFICES OF