This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 07:46:04 (UTC).

MLS & ASSOCIATES LLC VS FLORES, ANA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2005 MLS ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORES, ANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0562

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MLS & ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendants

FLORES ANA

TANG STEPHANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSTANT, MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2006
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • RETURNED MAIL-NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER SENT ON 7/5/05 DUE TO THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2005
  • RETURNED MAIL-NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER SENT ON 7/5/05 DUE TO THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2005
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • JUDGMENT GRANTED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONSTANT MARK ROBERT