This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 07:08:57 (UTC).

MILLER, RAY VS COOPER, GAIL D

Case Summary

On 01/18/2005 MILLER, RAY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COOPER, GAIL D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0043

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER RAY

Defendant

COOPER GAIL D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK, DENNIS P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2006
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2006
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2006
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 03/01/05 AT 09:30 A M IN DIV/DEPT WEC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR 03/01/05, 08:30 AM, DIV/DEPT 92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2005
  • JUDGMENT TENTATIVELY GRANTED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.