This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2016 at 19:43:55 (UTC).

Miller, Al Vs. Reynolds, Candice

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Miller Al against Reynolds Candice in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1132

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Thomas Parrott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miller Al

Defendant

Reynolds Candice

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. SOO , HON. COMMR. THOMAS PARROTT PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2001
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING TRIAL TO 05/09/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. SOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 04/10/01 AT 01:30P M., IN DIV. SOO .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2001
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (REYNOLDS, CANDICE) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (REYNOLDS, CANDICE) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2001
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2001
  • ANSWER FILED OF (REYNOLDS, CANDICE) . RECEIPT # FPS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2001
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2001
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN FPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.