This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2016 at 18:04:49 (UTC).

MELGAREJO, ARISTOTELES VS. STUEVE, VERA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2000 MELGAREJO, ARISTOTELES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STUEVE, VERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDRA APPLEBAUM and THOMAS KEISER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0791

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SANDRA APPLEBAUM

THOMAS KEISER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELGAREJO ARISTOTELES

Defendants

STUEVE VERA

STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF ARTHUR H. BARENS - ARTHUR H. BARENS ESQ

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ARTHUR H. BARENS

Defendant Attorney

CLINE & ASSOCIATES - KENNETH E. WRIGHT ESQ

Attorney at CLINE & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2002
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2001
  • NOTICE RE: STATUS CONFERENCE FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. SANDRA APPLEBAUM, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PER TELEPHONE CALL FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REQUEST TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. THE COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUED TO 06/12/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2001
  • ANSWER FILED OF (STUEVE, VERA) , (STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS INC.) . RECEIPT # SNI439479010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. THOMAS KEISER, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PER TELEPHONE CALL FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REQUEST TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. THE COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUED TO 05/11/01 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (STUEVE, VERA) . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS INC.) . COSTS OF $ 88.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2001
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/11/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2000
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI258286004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2000
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2000
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 03/05/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM . POSSIBLE STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARENS ARTHUR HUGO