This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 07:47:09 (UTC).

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPME VS. VALENZUELA, JOSE LUIS

Case Summary

On 12/20/2002 MEILOON INVESTMENT DEVELOPME filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VALENZUELA, JOSE LUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD VAN DUSEN and RICHARD W. VAN DUSEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1074

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD VAN DUSEN

RICHARD W. VAN DUSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC.

Defendants

VALENZUELA JOSE LUIS

CHAVEZ LUCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - KENNY KEAN TAN

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/20/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELM02U01074 TO PAS02UM1074

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2003
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER/CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSS./CLERK'S DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2003
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER FORWARDED TO THE SHERIFF'S OFFICE ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2003
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:00P M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. RICHARD W. VAN DUSEN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: CLAIM OF POSSESSION. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY: KENNY TAN ESQ . CLAIMANT APPEARING (CHAVEZ, LUCIA) . THE COURT RULES THAT THERE ARE NO VALID CLAIMS OF POSSESSION. THE LEVYING OFFICER IS ORDERED TO PROCEED WITH ENFORCEMENT OF THE WRIT OF POSSESSION AGAINST ANY OCCUPANT OR OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2002
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (VALENZUELA, JOSE LUIS) SIGNED AND FILED. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (U.D.), DECLARATION, AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # 333333016 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/06/03 AT 02:00P M, IN DIV. 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED BY (MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, LLC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • PLAINTIFF MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, LLC'S NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2002
  • ANSWER FILED OF (VALENZUELA, JOSE LUIS) . RECEIPT # WAIVERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (VALENZUELA, JOSE LUIS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2002
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 001 FOR CONSIDERATION RE FEE WAIVERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 285347002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF