Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 07:45:55 (UTC).

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPME VS. GUADALUPE, JOSE

Case Summary

On 12/19/2002 MEILOON INVESTMENT DEVELOPME filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUADALUPE, JOSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1070

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC.

Defendants

GUADALUPE JOSE AN INDIVIDUAL

MIRAMONTES IRENE AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - KENNY KEAN TAN

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2003
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2003
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/31/02 . FOR (MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, LLC.) . AGAINST (GUADALUPE, JOSE), AN INDIVIDUAL , (MIRAMONTES, IRENE), AN INDIVIDUAL . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 9619 3/4 CORTADA ST., EL MONTE, CA 91733 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2003
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2003
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. FORWARD TO EL MONTE SHERIFF . RECEIPT # 455132006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GUADALUPE, JOSE), AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 28.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MIRAMONTES, IRENE), AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 28.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GUADALUPE, JOSE), AN INDIVIDUAL , (MIRAMONTES, IRENE), AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 121.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER JUDGMENT FOR IMMEDIATE RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 455132.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF