This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2016 at 12:00:38 (UTC).

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPME VS. BELTRAN, NELLY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2003 MEILOON INVESTMENT DEVELOPME filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BELTRAN, NELLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES WITOFSKY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES WITOFSKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC

Defendant

BELTRAN NELLY AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - KENNY KEAN TAN

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/20/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELM03U00015 TO PAS03UM0015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2003
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2003
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, LLC) FOR REJECTION OF APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION: PLEASE CORRECT SECTION #2; THE DATE IS INCORRECT. PLEASE REFER TO YOUR COPY OF THE JUDGMENT. SUBMITTED ON 01/22/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2003
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. FORWARD TO ELM SHERIFF . RECEIPT # ELM333333001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2003
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:00P M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JAMES WITOFSKY, PRO TEMPORE JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AS FOLLOWS (SEE ATTACHED JUDGMENT):

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2003
  • REQUEST RE: JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BELTRAN, NELLY), AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 28.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, LLC) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT ON 1-15-03 SUBMITTED ON 01/16/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 001 FOR CONSIDERATION FEE WAIVER EDR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2003
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BELTRAN, NELLY), AN INDIVIDUAL . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2003
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (BELTRAN, NELLY), AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2003
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2003
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM257319016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2003
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF