Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 07:45:43 (UTC).

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPME VS. ALVISURIZ, RODOLFO

Case Summary

On 12/19/2002 MEILOON INVESTMENT DEVELOPME filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALVISURIZ, RODOLFO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD VAN DUSEN and RICHARD W. VAN DUSEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1069

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD VAN DUSEN

RICHARD W. VAN DUSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC.

Defendants

ALVISURIZ RODOLFO AN INDIVIDUAL

MORENO JESUS AN INDIVIDUAL

MEZA JULIAN

MORENO RODOLFO AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - KENNY KEAN TAN

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/20/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELM02U01069 TO PAS02UM1069

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2003
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2003
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2003
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 26.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2003
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. FORWARD TO EL MONTE SHERIFF . RECEIPT # 257319004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2003
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2002
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (ALVISURIZ, RODOLFO), AN INDIVIDUAL SIGNED AND FILED. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (U.D.), DECLARATION, AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # 333333015 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/06/03 AT 02:00P M, IN DIV. 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS FILED BY (MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, LLC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • PLAINTIFF MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, LLC'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2002
  • ANSWER FILED OF (ALVISURIZ, RODOLFO), AN INDIVIDUAL . RECEIPT # WAAIVERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (ALVISURIZ, RODOLFO), AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2002
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 001 FOR CONSIDERATION RE FEE WAIVERS (LA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 455132006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF