This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 06:55:05 (UTC).

MEDRANO, EDGAR VS. PAREDES, VIRGINIA

Case Summary

On 01/30/2002 MEDRANO, EDGAR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PAREDES, VIRGINIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0087

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDRANO EDGAR

Defendant

PAREDES VIRGINIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/30/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ORIGINALS TO ELA SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT . RECEIPT # CHECK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 18.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. COMMISSIONER DAVID SOTELO PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR. PROVE UP HEARING HELD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2002
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2002
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/14/02 . FOR (MEDRANO, EDGAR) . AGAINST (PAREDES, VIRGINIA) . PAST DUE RENT $ 1010.00 . DAILY DAMAGES $ 586.56 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 96.00 . TOTAL $ 1,692.56 . AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 2213 OLYMPIC BLVD., MONTEBELLO, CA 90640 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2002
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2002
  • NOTICE RE: OF OPPOSITION ON MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: ADMITTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2002
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (PAREDES, VIRGINIA) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: MOTION TO STRIKE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2002
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (PAREDES, VIRGINIA) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2002
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (PAREDES, VIRGINIA) , MOTION TO STRIKE IN PRO PER RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2002
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # WAIVER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/02 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELA235352006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less