This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 07:42:09 (UTC).

MCDANIELS, EDWARD C. VS. CHAMBERS, DANTE

Case Summary

On 12/01/2004 MCDANIELS, EDWARD C filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHAMBERS, DANTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3674

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDANIELS EDWARD C.

Defendants

CHAMBERS DANTE DBA.OLD SOLES SHOE SHOP

ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF EARL L. WILLIAMS - EARL L WILLIAMS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF EARL L. WILLIAMS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2004
  • JUDGMENT {CONTINUED} - ENTERED ON 12/23/04 . FOR (MCDANIELS, EDWARD C.) . AGAINST (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) . FOR A TOTAL OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 16.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RETURNED VIA U.S. MAIL . RECEIPT # CUL474108001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) . COSTS OF $ 36.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED & DEFAULT ENTERED OF (CHAMBERS, DANTE) DBA.(OLD SOLES SHOE SHOP) ON 12/15/04 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/15/04 . FOR (MCDANIELS, EDWARD C.) . AGAINST (CHAMBERS, DANTE) DBA.(OLD SOLES SHOE SHOP) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 4331 1/2 LEIMERT BLVD.,, LOS ANGELES, CA 90008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/05/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS ALAN L