Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 09:48:30 (UTC).

MAZDA AMERICAN CREDIT VS. ROMERO, TRACY

Case Summary

On 03/08/2002 MAZDA AMERICAN CREDIT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROMERO, TRACY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0194

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAZDA AMERICAN CREDIT

Defendant

ROMERO TRACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED - TODD A. MACDOWELL ESQ

Attorney at MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2012
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 202.74 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 8765.83 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 12C00415 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • PURSUANT TO A RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED ON THIS CASE AND ALL PAPERS HAVING BEEN PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER, THEREFORE, THE OLD CASE JACKET WAS DESTROYED ON 02/14/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2003
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM SANTA BARBARA COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED AS FOLLOWS: $ .00 APPLIED TO COST OF WRIT AND TO ACCRUED INTEREST (LINES 16 & 17). $ .00 APPLIED TO COLLECTION OF DAILY INTEREST (LINE 19) $ 177.74 APPLIED TO THE JUDGMENT (LINE 15).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SANTA BARBARA COUNTY. {OUTBOX} . RECEIPT # SNI439479010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2002
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # SNI478057009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2002
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT. PLTF. APPEARING BY DEC. CCP 585(D). NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2002
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2002
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2002
  • ORDER ALLOWING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2002
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 002 FOR CONSIDERATION RE: JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED. {BY PLAINTIFF}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROMERO, TRACY) . COSTS OF $ 52.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 06/11/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAZDA AMERICAN CREDIT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDOWELL & ASSOCIATES, LIMITED - TODD A. MACDOWELL