This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2016 at 04:34:14 (UTC).

Martinez, Celia Vs Mariano, Francisco

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Martinez Celia against Mariano Francisco in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5769

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martinez Celia

Defendant

Mariano Francisco

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2011
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 05/01/01, 09:00 AM, DIV/DEPT 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2001
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2001
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 05/01/01, 08:30 AM, DIV/DEPT 20U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2001
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2001
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE/PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION & SUMMONS/CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2001
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2001
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2001
  • OSC SET 04/20/01, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 8B, RM 732, NOTICE FILED & MAIL * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2001
  • OSC SET 04/20/01, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 8B, RM 426, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2001
  • A/C ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2001
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.